Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Ascough (Ayscough)

Deceased

Bishop of Salisbury, England


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Feb 1438AppointedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
20 Jul 1438Ordained BishopBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
29 Jun 1450DiedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Ascough (Ayscough):
Bishop William Ascough (Ayscough) (died ) Bishop of Salisbury

  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Google Books
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 603
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 230
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Sep 2014