Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Beckington

Deceased

Bishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1390Born
24 Jul 144353.5AppointedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
13 Oct 144353.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
14 Jan 146575.0DiedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Beckington
Bishop Thomas Beckington (born 1390, died ) Bishop of Bath and Wells

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeckington

  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 141
  • b/c2+: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 103
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018