Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Booth

Deceased

Archbishop of York, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Apr 1447AppointedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
9 Jul 1447Ordained BishopBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
21 Jul 1452AppointedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
12 Sep 1464DiedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Booth
Archbishop William Booth (died ) Archbishop of York

  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 553
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 135, and Page 148
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 111
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018