Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Le Hert

Deceased

Bishop of Norwich, England


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Jan 1446AppointedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
27 Mar 1446Ordained BishopBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
17 May 1472DiedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Walter Le Hert:
Bishop Walter Le Hert (died ) Bishop of Norwich

  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 467
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 205
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013