Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Thomas Cardinal Wolsey

Deceased

Archbishop of York, England

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia

Administrator of Winchester, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1471BornIpswitch
10 Mar 149827.2Ordained PriestPriest
6 Feb 151443.1AppointedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
26 Mar 151443.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
15 Sep 151443.7AppointedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
10 Sep 151544.7Elevated to Cardinal
10 Sep 151544.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
30 Jul 151847.6AppointedAdministrator of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
26 Mar 152352.2AppointedAdministrator of Durham, England, Great Britain
8 Feb 152958.1AppointedAdministrator of Winchester, England, Great Britain
21 Feb 153059.1ResignedAdministrator of Durham, England, Great Britain
29 Nov 153059.9DiedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Wolsey:
Cardinal Thomas Wolsey (died ) Archbishop of York

  • a priest for 32.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
  • a cardinal for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Sep 1515
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 143
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 130, and Page 225
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 335, and Page 190
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 16, and Page 112
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 189
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 293
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013