Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Young

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of London, England

Titular Bishop of Callipolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1463¹BornNewton Longville, Buckinghamshire
14 Apr 151350.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of London, England, Great Britain
14 Apr 151350.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Callipolis
3 Jul 151350.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Callipolis
28 Mar 152663.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of London, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Young
Bishop John Young (born 1463, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of London

  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 147
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 97
  • bp/bd/ab: CB, 18 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 18 Feb 2016