Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicholas Comyn

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Aug 1509AppointedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
21 Jan 1510Ordained BishopBishop of Ferns, Ireland
13 Apr 1519AppointedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
1548ResignedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Nicholas Comyn
Bishop Nicholas Comyn , Bishop Emeritus of Waterford and Lismore

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSt. Paul, Cathedral, London, Diocese of London, England, Great Britain

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 195, and Page 226
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 97
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1510, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 15 May 2018

Quantcast