Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Forteguerra, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pienza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1648³BornSiena
15 Sep 169850.2AppointedBishop of Pienza, Italy
21 Sep 169850.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pienza, Italy
Jan 1714³65.5DiedBishop of Pienza, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Forteguerra:
Bishop Antonio Forteguerra O.S.B. (born , died Jan 1714) Bishop of Pienza

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 314
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015