Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Fontana

Deceased

Bishop of Cesena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1644BornModigliana
5 Jun 169753.4AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
9 Jun 169753.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cesena, Italy
11 Mar 171672.2DiedBishop of Cesena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Fontana:
Bishop Giovanni Fontana (died ) Bishop of Cesena

  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 134
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013