Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastián Flóres Pabón

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1704³BornCasas de Don Antonio
29 Jul 177166.6AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
29 Sep 177166.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cuenca, Spain
25 Jul 177772.6DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastián Flóres Pabón:
Bishop Sebastián Flóres Pabón (born , died ) Bishop of Cuenca

  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 178
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 89, Number 451
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 14 Dec 2015