Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Urbano Felicio

Deceased

Bishop of Policastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1582³BornAquilae
14 Mar 162946.8AppointedBishop of Policastro, Italy
17 Apr 162946.8Ordained BishopBishop of Policastro, Italy
1635²52.6DiedBishop of Policastro, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Urbano Felicio:
Bishop Urbano Felicio (born ) Bishop of Policastro

  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 284
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1629, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 3 Mar 2015