Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego Ventura Fernández de Angulo, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ávila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1632²BornZamora, Spain
19 Oct 167644.8AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
11 Jan 168351.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Ávila, Spain
17 Mar 170068.2DiedBishop of Ávila, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Ventura Fernández de Angulo:
Archbishop Diego Ventura Fernández de Angulo O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Ávila

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 65, and Page 136
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1500, Page 214, Number 1,335

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014