Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco de Estrada

Deceased

Archbishop of Brindisi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1599¹BornMontilla, Spain
28 Jul 165960.6AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
17 Aug 165960.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
23 Nov 1671³72.9DiedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco de Estrada:
Archbishop Francesco de Estrada (died ) Archbishop of Brindisi

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 121, Number 738
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 123
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 190, Number 1,192

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013