Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jakob von Eltz

Deceased

Archbishop of Trier, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1510¹Born
6 Apr 155040.2Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
7 Apr 156757.2SelectedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
22 Aug 156757.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
17 Apr 156858.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trier, Germany
4 Jun 158171.4DiedArchbishop of Trier, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jakob von Eltz (VIAF: 64802197)
Archbishop Jakob von Eltz (born 1510, died ) Archbishop of Trier

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die BischŲfe des Heiligen RŲmischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 317
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1569, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018