Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marquard von Hattstein

Deceased

Bishop of Speyer, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1529Born
16 Aug 155930.6SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Speyer, Germany
13 May 156031.3ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Speyer, Germany
4 Sep 156031.6AppointedBishop of Speyer, Germany
8 Sep 156132.6Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
7 Dec 158152.9DiedBishop of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Marquard von Hattstein (VIAF: 34841913)
Bishop Marquard von Hattstein (born 1529, died ) Bishop of Speyer

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBruchsaal

  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1561, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 303

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast