Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Binsfeld

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

Titular Bishop of Azotus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1545¹Born
12 Feb 158035.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
12 Feb 158035.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Azotus
2 Feb 158136.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Azotus
19 Sep 159853.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Binsfeld (VIAF: 42778836)
Bishop Peter Binsfeld (born 1545, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBinsfelf
Ordained BishopWittlich

  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,825
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 127
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1581, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018