Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gerard Cardinal van Groesbeeck

Deceased

Bishop of Liège, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1517²Born
5 Jun 156447.4SelectedBishop of Liège, Belgium
23 Feb 156548.1ConfirmedBishop of Liège, Belgium
20 May 156548.3Ordained BishopBishop of Liège, Belgium
21 Feb 157861.1Elevated to Cardinal
23 Dec 158063.9DiedBishop of Liège, Belgium

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerard van Groesbeeck (VIAF: 1185499)
Gerard Cardinal van Groesbeeck (born 1517, died ) Bishop of Liège

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuringen
Ordained BishopHerkenrode, Abbey, Hasselt
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Lambert, Cathedral, Liège, Diocese of Liège

  • a bishop for 15.5 years
  • a cardinal for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Feb 1578
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1565, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 222

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018