Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Abraham Elias, C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Sehna (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Oct 1893³BornSoldouz
6 Sep 193844.9AppointedArchbishop of Sehna (Chaldean), Iran
24 Apr 193945.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sehna (Chaldean), Iran
15 Feb 194046.4DiedArchbishop of Sehna (Chaldean), Iran

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Abraham Elias:
Archbishop Abraham Elias C.M. (died ) Archbishop of Sehna

  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,367
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013