Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fortunato Durante

Deceased

Bishop of Squillace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1655BornAlbi
20 Nov 169742.9AppointedBishop of Squillace, Italy
24 Nov 169742.9Ordained BishopBishop of Squillace, Italy
23 Nov 171459.9DiedBishop of Squillace, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fortunato Durante:
Bishop Fortunato Durante (died ) Bishop of Squillace

  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 363

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013