Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni De Simone, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Conversano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1761Born
3 Mar 178725.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
10 Jan 182260.2SelectedBishop of Trivento, Italy
19 Apr 182260.5ConfirmedBishop of Trivento, Italy
21 Apr 182260.5Ordained BishopBishop of Trivento, Italy
3 Jun 182664.6SelectedBishop of Conversano, Italy
3 Jul 182664.7ConfirmedBishop of Conversano, Italy
13 Aug 184785.8DiedBishop of Conversano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni De Simone
Bishop Giovanni De Simone C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Conversano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 162, and Page 378
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1822, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018