Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista de Paola

Deceased

Bishop of Bisignano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1576²Born
27 May 162650.4AppointedBishop of Bisignano, Italy
1 Jun 162650.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bisignano, Italy
6 Nov 165781.8DiedBishop of Bisignano, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista de Paola
Bishop Giovanni Battista de Paola (born 1576, died ) Bishop of Bisignano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontalto, Diocese of Bisignano
Ordained BishopQuirinal (Montecavallo) Palace, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceBisignano, Diocese of Bisignano

  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 115
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 34
  • ob/c2/loc: AT, 28 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 29 Nov 2018

Quantcast