Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean du Dousset (Doucet)

Deceased

Bishop of Belley, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1665Born
5 Oct 171247.0AppointedBishop of Belley, France
11 Dec 171247.1Ordained BishopBishop of Belley, France
4 Feb 174579.3DiedBishop of Belley, France

MicroData Summary for Jean du Dousset (Doucet)
Bishop Jean du Dousset (Doucet) (born , died ) Bishop of Belley

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCussac

  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 116
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1712, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast