Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Delfino

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Belluno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1589²Born
9 Feb 162637.1AppointedBishop of Belluno, Italy
22 Feb 162637.1Ordained BishopBishop of Belluno, Italy
24 Jun 163445.4ResignedBishop of Belluno, Italy
23 Jun 165970.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Belluno, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Delfino
Bishop Giovanni Delfino (born 1589, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Belluno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopSistine Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 112
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 7
  • b/ob/c2: AT, 20 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017