Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agazio di Somma

Deceased

Bishop of Catanzaro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1591¹BornSimeri
13 Jan 165968.0AppointedBishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy
28 Apr 166473.3AppointedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
1 Oct 167180.8DiedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agazio di Somma:
Bishop Agazio di Somma (died ) Bishop of Catanzaro

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 135, and Page 141

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013