Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Dionisio de Villavicencio, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1664BornSevilla, Spain
1 Jul 172661.9AppointedBishop of Nicaragua
17 Dec 173066.4InstalledBishop of Nicaragua
25 Dec 173571.4DiedBishop of Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Francisco Dionisio de Villavicencio:
Bishop Francisco Dionisio de Villavicencio O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Nicaragua

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013