Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Di Giangirolamo

Deceased

Bishop of CittÓ Ducale, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1621¹Born
12 Jan 168261.0AppointedBishop of CittÓ Ducale, Italy
18 Jan 168261.0Ordained BishopBishop of CittÓ Ducale, Italy
1 Oct 168564.7DiedBishop of CittÓ Ducale, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Di Giangirolamo
Bishop Francesco Di Giangirolamo (born 1621, died ) Bishop of CittÓ Ducale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRieti, Diocese of Rieti
Ordained BishopSant’Ignazio, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 160
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1682, Number 33
  • ob/c2: AT, 20 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 21 Jan 2021

Quantcast