Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuele Custo

Deceased

Bishop of Mazara del Vallo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1765BornPalermo
7 Mar 178924.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jul 181651.4SelectedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
23 Sep 181651.6ConfirmedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
29 Sep 181651.7Ordained BishopBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
8 Jul 182964.4DiedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emmanuele Custo:
Bishop Emmanuele Custo (born , died ) Bishop of Mazara del Vallo

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 258
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,717

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013