Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gianbattista Colombini, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Benevento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1703BornBrixien
6 Apr 172623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
19 Dec 176360.7AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
8 Jan 176460.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
3 Feb 177470.8DiedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gianbattista Colombini:
Archbishop Gianbattista Colombini O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Archbishop of Benevento

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 121

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013