Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Colangelo, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1769BornNapoli
178313.1ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
21 Dec 179324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
3 Jul 182050.6SelectedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
27 Jun 182151.6ConfirmedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
29 Jun 182151.6Ordained BishopBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
15 Jan 183666.1DiedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Colangelo:
Bishop Francesco Colangelo C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 141

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013