Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola Cioffi

Deceased

Archbishop of Amalfi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1697BornNapoli
23 Dec 171922.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
20 Dec 172124.1Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
13 Apr 174446.5AppointedBishop of Sora, Italy
1 May 174446.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sora, Italy
19 Feb 174850.3AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
31 Mar 175860.4DiedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Cioffi:
Archbishop Nicola Cioffi (born , died ) Archbishop of Amalfi

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1753
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 78, and Page 384

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Sep 2013