Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre-Henri de Chauvigny de Blot

Deceased

Bishop of Lombez, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1751Born
9 Dec 178736.9SelectedBishop of Lombez, France
10 Mar 178837.1ConfirmedBishop of Lombez, France
30 Mar 178837.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lombez, France
4 Feb 180554.0DiedBishop of Lombez, France

MicroData Summary for Alexandre-Henri de Chauvigny de Blot
Bishop Alexandre-Henri de Chauvigny de Blot (born , died ) Bishop of Lombez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Gal-sur-Sioule

  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1788, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 269

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018