Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Barthélemy-Louis-Martin de Chaumont de La Galaisière

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Dié


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1737BornParis
18 Feb 177436.4SelectedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
28 Jul 177739.9ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
21 Sep 177740.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Dié, France
29 Nov 180164.2ResignedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
30 Jun 180870.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Dié, France

MicroData Summary for Barthélemy-Louis-Martin de Chaumont de La Galaisière
Bishop Barthélemy-Louis-Martin de Chaumont de La Galaisière (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Dié

  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1777, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 193

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016