Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Cernuschi

Deceased

Bishop of Como


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1691BornMilano
13 Mar 172331.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Mar 172331.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 173947.5AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
25 Jul 173947.6Ordained BishopBishop of Como, Italy
15 Apr 174654.3DiedBishop of Como, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Cernuschi:
Bishop Paolo Cernuschi (born , died ) Bishop of Como

  • a priest for 23.0 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 176
  • c34: CB, 14 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015