Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Centomani

Deceased

Bishop of Monopoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1653³Born
25 Jul 167824.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 Jul 167824.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 Apr 170753.4AppointedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
24 Apr 170753.4Ordained BishopBishop of Monopoli, Italy
Jan 1722³68.1DiedBishop of Monopoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Centomani
Bishop Nicola Centomani (born , died Jan 1722) Bishop of Monopoli

EventPlace
Birth PlacePotenza, Diocese of Potenza
Ordained BishopSan Pietro in Vincoli, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceMonopoli, Diocese of Monopoli

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,707
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 273
  • ob/c2: CB, 23 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,248
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,707, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast