Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luca Cellesi

Deceased

Bishop of Martirano (Martoranum)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1577¹BornPistoia
25 May 161942.4Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jul 162750.5AppointedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
1 Aug 162750.6Ordained BishopBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
Jul 1661³84.5DiedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luca Cellesi:
Bishop Luca Cellesi Bishop of Martirano (Martoranum)

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 233
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 89, Number 531

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013