Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gasparo Cecchinelli

Deceased

Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1587¹BornSarzana
13 May 163043.3AppointedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
20 May 163043.3Ordained BishopBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
4 May 164154.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
Apr 1644³57.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
1666²79.0DiedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gasparo Cecchinelli (VIAF: 88738841)
Bishop Gasparo Cecchinelli (born 1587, died 1666) Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone

  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 247
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1630, Number 6
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 260

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Oct 2016