Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Catelan

Deceased

Bishop of Valence


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1659¹BornToulouse
Feb 1690³31.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Aug 170546.6SelectedBishop of Valence, France
14 Dec 170546.9ConfirmedBishop of Valence, France
21 Feb 170647.1Ordained BishopBishop of Valence, France
7 Jan 172566.0DiedBishop of Valence, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Catelan:
Bishop Jean de Catelan (born 1659, died ) Bishop of Valence

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 403
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015