Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Carpegna

Deceased

Bishop of Gubbio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1592¹Born
11 Dec 162836.9AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
6 Jan 162937.0Ordained BishopBishop of Gubbio, Italy
19 Jun 163038.4DiedBishop of Gubbio, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Carpegna
Bishop Pietro Carpegna (born 1592, died ) Bishop of Gubbio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScaolini

  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 183
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1629, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast