Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Caravita, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Conza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1640BornNapoli
16 Jan 167333.0AppointedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
29 Jan 167333.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Conza, Italy
26 Sep 168141.7DiedArchbishop of Conza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Caravita:
Archbishop Paolo Caravita O.S.B. (died ) Archbishop of Conza

  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 166

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013