Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mario Carafa

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Oct 1565AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
10 Feb 1566Ordained BishopArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
11 Sep 1576DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario Carafa (VIAF: 90145594)
Archbishop Mario Carafa (died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 255
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 8, Number 7
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1566, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018