Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Benedetto Cardinal Cappelletti

Deceased

Bishop of Rieti

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1764BornRieti
30 Sep 183166.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
2 Jul 183267.6Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 183268.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
29 Jul 183368.7AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
15 Aug 183368.7Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti, Italy
15 May 183469.5DiedBishop of Rieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Cappelletti (VIAF: 89063665)
Benedetto Cardinal Cappelletti (born , died ) Bishop of Rieti

  • a bishop for .7 years
  • a cardinal for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 319
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1833, Number 35
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Sep 1831

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Aug 2016