Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ippolito Campioni, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chiusi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1601BornSenen
14 Dec 163737.0AppointedBishop of Chiusi, Italy
3 Jan 163837.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chiusi, Italy
27 Jan 164746.1DiedBishop of Chiusi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ippolito Campioni:
Bishop Ippolito Campioni O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Chiusi

  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 100, Number 606
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 155

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013