Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Caffori (Cafferi)

Deceased

Bishop of Castro di Puglia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1636¹BornGrottaglia
1 Sep 168145.6AppointedBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy
14 Sep 168145.7Ordained BishopBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy
8 Dec 168145.9DiedBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Caffori (Cafferi):
Bishop Francesco Maria Caffori (Cafferi) (born 1636, died ) Bishop of Castro di Puglia

  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 148
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 20 Apr 2015