Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dionisio Bussotti, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Apr 1638AppointedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
25 Apr 1638Ordained BishopBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
24 Oct 1654DiedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy

MicroData Summary for Dionisio Bussotti
Bishop Dionisio Bussotti O.S.M. (died ) Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)

  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 124
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 101, Number 610
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1638, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018