Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Kreutter de Corvinis, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vieste, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1658Born
20 Nov 169738.9AppointedBishop of Vieste, Italy
24 Nov 169738.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vieste, Italy
14 Jul 170142.6DiedBishop of Vieste, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Kreutter de Corvinis
Bishop Lorenzo Kreutter de Corvinis O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Vieste

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 412
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018