Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Giuseppe Bonaventura

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Piceno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1649BornSessa Aurunca
5 Oct 169949.8AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
11 Oct 169949.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
Dec 1709³60.0DiedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Giuseppe Bonaventura:
Bishop Giovanni Giuseppe Bonaventura (born , died Dec 1709) Bishop of Ascoli Piceno

  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 100
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1699, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015