Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Bonaventura

Deceased

Bishop of Cesena


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Mar 1629AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
17 Apr 1629Ordained BishopBishop of Cesena, Italy
23 Jul 1653DiedBishop of Cesena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Bonaventura:
Bishop Pietro Bonaventura (died ) Bishop of Cesena

  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 127
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1629, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 3 Mar 2015