Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Luis Blanco

Deceased

Bishop of León


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1749BornValverde del Fresno
11 Aug 180050.9AppointedBishop of León, Spain
16 Nov 180051.2Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
22 Nov 181162.2DiedBishop of León, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Luis Blanco:
Bishop Pedro Luis Blanco (born , died ) Bishop of León

  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1800, Number 19
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,363
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 234
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 119, Number 627

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015