Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Antonio Bertodano

Deceased

Bishop of Vercelli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1639BornBielle
29 Oct 166223.3Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jun 169757.9AppointedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
9 Jun 169757.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vercelli, Italy
4 May 170060.8DiedBishop of Vercelli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Antonio Bertodano:
Bishop Giuseppe Antonio Bertodano (born , died ) Bishop of Vercelli

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 410
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015