Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Antonio Diego Bernardi, O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Martirano (Martoranum)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1699BornFuscaldo
7 Jun 172122.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of the Minims
30 May 172223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Minims
16 Dec 174344.5AppointedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
22 Dec 174344.5Ordained BishopBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
14 May 175858.9DiedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Antonio Diego Bernardi:
Bishop Bernardino Antonio Diego Bernardi O.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Martirano (Martoranum)

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,875
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1755
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 279
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015